Trustees BRIGHTON FIVE DEANS U3A
Charity number: 1163495

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Jane Bushell | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Fisher | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Margaret Cambell Halls | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Peatfield | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ann Titheradge | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Fisher | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Ann Humphrey-Lewis | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Stefan Fodor | Trustee | 11 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bill McNaught | Trustee | 28 November 2016 |
|
|||||
ANNE BICKMORE | Trustee | 25 January 2012 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.