Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE METROPOLITAN POLICE HISTORICAL COLLECTION

Charity Number: 1167839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 11 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 11 December 2024 310 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 11 December 2024 675 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 December 2024 1040 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 31 March 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required