SPECIAL NEEDS OLDER RABBITS SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF OLDER AND SPECIAL NEEDS RABBITS IN NEED OF SPECIAL CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MISTREATMENT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AN END OF LIFE SANCTUARY FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THEIR CARE THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 August 2015: CIO registration
- SNORS (Working name)
- SPECIAL NEEDS OLDER RABBIT SANCTUARY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL JANE SEDDON | Chair | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Holly Bowman | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Michelle Weaver | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HAMLIN | Trustee | 14 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.28k | £24.66k | £31.96k | £33.34k | £39.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.57k | £14.48k | £19.14k | £29.22k | £29.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF OLDER AND SPECIAL NEEDS RABBITS IN NEED OF SPECIAL CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, NEGLECT OR MISTREATMENT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE AN END OF LIFE SANCTUARY FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THEIR CARE THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
S N O R S
PO Box 1269
WARRINGTON
WA1 9GD
- Phone:
- 07369272129
- Email:
- snors_enquiries@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
snors.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window