DARTMOUTH GREEN PARTNERSHIPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dartmouth Green Partnerships has a team of volunteers who create floral displays for Dartmouth through the seasons and help maintain public planted spaces. It provides advice and assistance to other organisations working to improve green spaces in the town and works with schools, young people's groups, and older people. It is raising funds to build the Dartmouth Community Greenhouse to grow plants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 26 November 2015: CIO registration
- DGP (DARTMOUTH IN BLOOM) (Working name)
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVIE ROGERS | Chair | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Walker Gilland | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Ann Holgate | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT MICHAEL LYON | Trustee | 09 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
TESSA DE GALLEANI | Trustee | 06 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR RICHARD WILLIAM INGRAM COOKE | Trustee | 12 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATHY STANSFIELD | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEBBIE MORRIS | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.80k | £10.12k | £25.04k | £30.12k | £16.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.36k | £8.03k | £16.30k | £38.81k | £17.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.95k | £1.25k | £8.00k | £1.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 26 NOV 2015 AMENDED ON 06 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE HORTICULTURE AND FLORICULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO LIVE IN OR VISIT DARTMOUTH BY THE PROVISION OF FLORAL DISPLAYS, SHRUBS AND LANDSCAPES IN PLACES VISIBLE TO THE PUBLIC AND BY THE CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ECOLOGICAL SUSTAINABILITY, CONSERVATION, RECYCLING AND BIODIVERSITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Dartmouth Visitor Centre
Dartmouth Visitor Centre
Mayor's Avenue
Dartmouth
Devon
TQ6 9YY
- Phone:
- 01803712437
- Email:
- stevie@ashtreefarm.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window