Accounts and annual returns SWANSEA COUNSELLING AND WELLBEING SERVICE
Charity number: 1163916

Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 461 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 826 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1191 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1556 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window