SWANSEA COUNSELLING AND WELLBEING SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
One to one counselling sessions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 09 October 2015: CIO registration
- SCWS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MRS LIZ THOMAS-EVANS | Chair | 29 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Thomas | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Thomas-Jones | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stefan Eckardt | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
MS GILL THOMAS | Trustee | 26 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.00k | £3.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.44k | £2.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 830 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1195 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1560 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL SICKNESS OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN SWANSEA BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
81 SARON ROAD
SARON
AMMANFORD
SA18 3LH
- Phone:
- 07403254884
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window