AKURANA WELFARE ASSOCIATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Emigrated Akurana (town in Sri Lanka) people who live in Leicester gather some some money and send to Akurana town for people in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 31 July 2015: Standard registration
- (AWA UK) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMED AJMEER JAMALDEEN | Chair | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KAHAWATTE GEDERA M A MUHAMED IMRAN | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
FAWAS MOHAMED FAROOK | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|||||
RIYAS MOHAMED MOHAMED ANVER | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
AMANULLA MOHAMED SALEEM | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED FAYAZ MOHAMED ISHAQ | Trustee | 10 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
SHAFEEK MOHAMED | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RIFKHAN MOHAMED | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.08k | £15.42k | £10.87k | £15.30k | £22.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.67k | £17.72k | £17.48k | £8.02k | £32.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 February 2022 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 JAN 2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QUR'AAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH); (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED AND THE I. GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SCHOOLS, LIBRARIES AND TRAINING CENTRES, AND THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAID PERSONS; (3) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING AMONG POOR PEOPLE, THE DISABLED, VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR FOOD, CLOTHING, BURIALS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (4) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE POOR, UNDERPRIVILEGED AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF CLINICS, EQUIPMENT, MEDICINES OR GRANTS FOR MEDICAL DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT, OR PROVISION OF HEALTH EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Sahara Close
LEICESTER
LE4 5EJ
- Phone:
- 07877732634
- Email:
- ajmeer9@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window