NEW HAW COMMUNITY HUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW LIDDICOTT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALEXANDER REID BA (HONS) | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS AMY NAWAZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1192 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1557 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE CIO’S OBJECT ARE TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF NEW HAW, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TRAIN FOR THE FUTURE TODAY
294 Woodham Lane
New Haw
Addlestone
KT15 3NT
- Phone:
- 07988684363
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window