THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FRANT WITH ERIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship, open to all The provision of sacred space for personal prayer and contemplation Pastoral Care, including visiting the sick and bereaved Teaching Christianity through sermons, small groups and courses Taking religious assemblies in school The provision of youth groups with a Christina ethos Promoting the whole mission of the Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 06 July 2015: Previously excepted registration
- FRANT WITH ERIDGE PCC (Working name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kyle Donovan Laidler | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Mary Alexander | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Alison Murdoch | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Holton | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Stevens | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Nightingale | Trustee | 26 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Brendan Martin | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Creedy Smith | Trustee | 26 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Halmshaw | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Huggett | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Barnes | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
David James Torr | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN DAVID LYNN FCA | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Lynn | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE VINCER | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rev ASHLEY JAMES TRASK | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.02k | £117.38k | £143.48k | £194.05k | £158.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.99k | £125.59k | £139.57k | £194.41k | £170.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Stables
Church Lane
Frant
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN3 9DX
- Phone:
- 01892 864304
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window