BADDIBU SOCIETY UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Empower child education in the Gambia by donating stationary to schools. Sponsor victims of natural disasters. Promote health care by donating medical equipment to hospitals. Engage on fundraising events to fulfil the charity's humanitarian objectives. Promote the Gambian culture by organizing cultural events at a park or hall in the UK. Undertake yearly family trip to the UK seaside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Manchester City
- Throughout London
- The Gambia
Governance
- 29 July 2015: CIO registration
- BASUK (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lang Kawsu Suwareh | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariama Dibba-Demba | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
EBOU JUWARA | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mariama Touray Njie | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
YUSUPHA JAMMEH | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alikali Fofana | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MUSA JAMMEH | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Omar Daffe | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MUSTAPHA JAITEH | Trustee | 01 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.14k | £9.34k | £7.14k | £5.78k | £5.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.50k | £7.34k | £3.48k | £1.03k | £5.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2022 | 271 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 July 2022 | 271 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 29 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1)THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN BADDIBU (NORTHERN REGION OF THE GAMBIA)BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH EDUCATION, TRAINING AND ITEMS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DEEM APPROPRIATE; 2)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PART OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF BEING A MEMBER OF A SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DEPRIVED COMMUNITY OR THOSE WHO ARE SOCIAL EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR RELATIONSHIP OR FAMILY BREAKDOWN; 3)TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE THROUGH CONCILIATION FOR COUPLES WHOSE RELATIONSHIPS APPEAR TO BE BREAKING DOWN, AND WHERE SUCH RELATIONSHIPS HAVE ALREADY BROKEN DOWN, TO ADVISE AND HELP IN THE SETTLEMENT OF DIFFERENCES OR POTENTIAL DIFFERENCES OVER ASSOCIATED MATTERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR MEMBERS OF THE GAMBIAN COMMUNITY WHO REQUIRE A MORE TAILORED SERVICE DUE TO THEIR CULTURAL PERSPECTIVES OF FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS THAN THAT WHICH GENERAL MAINSTREAM SERVICES PROVIDE; AND 4)THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, TO ASSIST IN THE BURIAL OF DECEASED FAMILY MEMBERS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THEIR CULTURAL BELIEFS AND THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO MEMBERS OF THE DIASPORAN COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
BADDIBU (NORTHERN REGION OF THE GAMBIA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
517 Katherine Road
London
E7 8DR
- Phone:
- 07807307403
- Website:
-
alikali.fofana@baddibusocietyuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window