Accounts and annual returns OUR BRAVE KNIGHT

Charity number: 1162745
Charity reporting is overdue by 364 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 364 days
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 364 days
Annual return 01 July 2022 26 July 2023 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2021 21 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2020 06 June 2021 36 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 July 2019 21 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2019 Not Required