THE SHEFFIELD FOOTBALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Sheffield Football Trust is a charity established to oversee the operation of football/ sports facilities in Sheffield, initially funded via the Parklife football hubs programme. The Sheffield Football Trust has a long term lease on three sites (Graves, Thorncliffe and Westfield) and has procured an operational partner, Leisure United to manage the facilities and deliver against the Sheffield
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 October 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kabier Aslam | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Jamie Alexander Blair | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Allan Ogle | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Robert Bailey | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Frost | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.51k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32k | £305 | £6.78k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 29 June 2022 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12 MAY 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/09/2015 as amended on 21 Mar 2000
Charitable objects
3. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS: 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR PHYSICAL EDUCATION, WITH A FOCUS ON CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH A VIEW TO HELPING CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP AND GROW TO MATURITY AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wembley Stadium
Wembley Park
Wembley
London
England
HA9 0WS
- Phone:
- 07904177858
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window