ONE COMMUNITY TRUST KEYNSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities & services for young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 07 October 2015: CIO registration
- @ONE COMMUNITY TRUST KEYNSHAM (Previous name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL LESLIE JENKINS | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Justine Buxton | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ella Coultish | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Norris | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane Lovell BSc | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Moss | Trustee | 01 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Tredget | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNE GILLIAN HEWETT | Trustee | 19 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr RICHARD PANNETT | Trustee | 18 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY BRIAN FURBER | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|||||
DAVID NORMAN SPRAGUE | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.22k | £14.27k | £19.07k | £18.85k | £17.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.14k | £12.89k | £12.26k | £17.90k | £20.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 07 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
ONE COMMUNITY TRUST OPERATES FROM A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, & IS BASED AT THE @ONE BUILDING IN KEYNSHAM, ADJACENT TO ST JOHN'S CHURCH. OUR OBJECTIVE IS: TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES THAT CONFORM TO A CHRISTIAN ETHOS, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 THE HOMESTEAD
KEYNSHAM
BRISTOL
BS31 1LF
- Phone:
- 01179864792
- Email:
- OCTKeynsham@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window