ZION BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity Number: 1162105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £91,463
Total expenditure: £106,577

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 June 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Louise De Vaux Trustee 28 July 2024
None on record
Rev Jason De Vaux Trustee 29 May 2022
None on record
Geoffrey Mann Trustee 18 November 2014
HOPE CAMBRIDGE
Received: On time
GOOD NEWS FOR EVERYONE!
Received: On time
CAMBRIDGE STREET PASTORS
Received: On time
ROGER WRIGHT Trustee 18 November 2014
None on record
JANE MANN Trustee 14 November 2014
CAMBRIDGE STREET PASTORS
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £112.54k £106.30k £104.73k £101.04k £91.46k
Total expenditure £127.19k £108.45k £180.09k £92.52k £106.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
ZION BAPTIST CHURCH
1 EAST ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 1BD
Phone:
01223576385
Website:

zionbc.org.uk