GCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GCH Trust exists to advance the Christian religion primarily by: 1 - encouraging and facilitating the founding and operation of Christian churches primarily, although not exclusively, in the North East of England 2 - encouraging the seeking of new followers of the Christian religion 3 - facilitating the training and development of individuals in their understanding of the Christian religion
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 15 July 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benjamin Parker | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ARMSTRONG HALL | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SCOTT THOMSON | Trustee | 15 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.60k | £94.40k | £85.14k | £67.54k | £127.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.59k | £51.53k | £55.06k | £61.62k | £213.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: - ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING THE FOUNDING AND OPERATION OF CHRISTIAN CHURCHES PRIMARILY, ALTHOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE NORTH EAST AND THE REST OF THE UNITED KINGDOM; - ENCOURAGING THE SEEKING OF NEW FOLLOWERS AND ADHERENTS OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; AND - FACILITATING THE TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT OF INDIVIDUALS IN THEIR UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 Rillston Close
HARTLEPOOL
Cleveland
TS26 0PS
- Phone:
- 07749286869
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window