ESCOMBE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities: Carpet bowls; Dog training; Ballet classes; U3A meetings; Kalmababy & toddler yoga; Adult Yoga'; First Aid training;; Dance fit; Band practice. Events: Monthly Coffee mornings; book swap; 22 Children's parties; Ballet exams; Polling station; Ballet display; Birthday coffee morning; Yoga retreat; Family Action daay;60th WA; Tea party for jubilee and defibrillator installation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
Governance
- 16 July 2015: CIO registration
- 17 November 2015: Funds received from 1066314 ESCOMBE AMENITY HALL AND GEORGE PIT COMMUNITY ASSO...
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR ROB YORKE | Chair | 30 September 2015 |
|
|||||
ERIC YATES | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MELO-YATES | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Balmer Mrs. | Trustee | 02 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
LYN HESLOP Mrs. | Trustee | 30 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.11k | £18.33k | £26.46k | £10.93k | £15.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.67k | £11.15k | £7.97k | £8.83k | £9.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £13.90k | £19.34k | £2.97k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 16 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ESCOMBE AREA (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; B) ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE" AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE CENTRE, WHETHER ALONE OR IN COOPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY, IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-PARTY IN POLITICS AND NON-SECTARIAN IN RELIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE VILLAGE HALL
HIGH ESCOMB
BISHOP AUCKLAND
COUNTY DURHAM
DL14 7ST
- Phone:
- 07470 819 800
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window