Financial history THE SIMON TRUST (AUTISM) CIO

Charity Number: 1163069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £35.25k £4.32k £25.19k £27.25k £20.27k
Total expenditure £32.00k £21.13k £47.37k £59.79k £29.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A