PERSIAN ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide assistance and advocacy to asylum seekers and refugees in the UK, women and children subject to domestic abuse, in particular, but not exclusively to Iranians and Farsi speakers. To provide support services, to advance them in life, and assist them with the adaption and integration within a new community. To promote Persian Culture and freedom of speech, particularly for Iranian women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
Total income includes £249,008 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 August 2015: CIO registration
- PAB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FOUJON B NAINI | Chair | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Aryan Chobin | Trustee | 31 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Atusa Tehrani | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
FARANAK REZAZADEH GRAPHIC | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.83k | £77.38k | £120.00k | £173.00k | £293.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.80k | £28.48k | £165.00k | £104.00k | £205.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.00k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.00k | £98.00k | £152.00k | £249.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO IRANIANS AND FARSI SPEAKERS (AFGHAN, TAJIK, KURDS, BALLOCH, AZERI) AND THEIR FAMILIES LIVING IN LONDON TO PROVIDE TRAINING FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM WITH THE ADAPTION WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY, WITH THE OBJECTS OF: - 1.PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH 2.ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION AND TRAINING; 3.RELIEVING THEM FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND UNEMPLOYMENT; 4.PROMOTING ART, CULTURE AND HERITAGE; AND 5.TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Hendon lane
Finchley
London
N3 1TT
- Phone:
- 020 8446 1716
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window