WOOLF TRUST CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Woolf Trust Charity is a family charity that is accumulating funds to be distributed to worthy charities, particularly connected with sick or disadvantaged children. The charity will in time receive funds from fund raising events and legacies that will increase the ability to offer more help. The charity is also a vehicle for our trustees and connections to volunteer their time to these causes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERNARD WOOLF | Chair | 13 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Linda Woolf | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WOOLF | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
SIMON WOOLF | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA WOOLF | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.08k | £1.09k | £1.08k | £1.08k | £1.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 APR 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE SUPPORT OR PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
148 Wood Street
Barnet
EN5 4DB
- Phone:
- 07973133926
- Email:
- Bernard@sq2workspace.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window