COVENTRY PRIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running the Annual LGBT Pride Festival to celebrate the diversity of the LGBT community and to increase the social cohesion and inclusiveness of the LGBT local community. Other events are organised including but not limited to IDAHOT, TDOR, National Coming Out Day, TDOV, World Aids Day, LGBT History Month. Running awareness campaigns surrounding LGBT sexual health and identity issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 October 2015: CIO registration
- COV PRIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jordan Laws | Chair | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Juliette Thevar | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.82k | £6.56k | £56.27k | £2.54k | £594 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.31k | £7.75k | £25.79k | £33.05k | £8.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £55.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 09 January 2025 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 17 August 2023 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 17 August 2023 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 10 July 2023 | 405 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 10 July 2023 | 405 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2022 | 365 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 31 May 2022 | 365 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 01 July 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 20 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ORGANISING AN ANNUAL LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANS PRIDE EVENT AND OTHER EVENTS INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE COMMEMORATION OF INTERNATIONAL DAY AGAINST HOMOPHOBIA AND TRANSPHOBIA (IDAHOT), LGBT HISTORY MONTH, TRANSGENDER DAY OF REMEMBRANCE, COMING OUT DAY AND WORLD AIDS DAY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 Abercorn Road
COVENTRY
CV5 8EE
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- info@coventrypride.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window