EN:ABLE COMMUNITIES CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EN:Able Communities works in partnership with social landlords in Yorkshire and Humber to 1) Enable social mobility through commissioning social enterprises to prepare people from disadvantaged socio-economic areas/ personal backgrounds to be ready for work, with a focus (but not exclusively) on working with the construction trade 2) Supports community groups by offering grants
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 25 August 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Champ | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Blakley Taylor | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ken Taylor | Trustee | 10 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Holmes | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lee Winterbottom | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Epiphany Kidd | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £333.49k | £44.61k | £311.06k | £85.18k | £54.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.53k | £362.96k | £288.27k | £30.27k | £33.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £291.94k | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROMOTION OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN RECOGNISED AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS; (A) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDE UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (C) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE ON CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESSES OR TO EXISTING BUSINESS; (D) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; AND (E) TO MAINTAIN, IMPROVE OR PROVIDE PUBLIC AMENITIES AND COMMUNITY CENTRES. (2) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH LAW) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Collaboration Works
2 Carbrook Street
Carbrook
Sheffield
S9 2JE
- Phone:
- 07884559122
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window