FRIENDS OF BAXTER COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GROUP OF FRIENDS/PARENTS WHO FUNDRAISE FOR PROJECTS WHICH BENEFIT THE PUPILS OF BAXTER COLLEGE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 28 June 1977: Standard registration
- HARRY CHESHIRE HIGH SCHOOL PARENT-TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- HARRY CHESHIRE PARENTS ASSOC (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faith Jevons | Trustee | 11 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Carpenter | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1 | £0 | £413 | £287 | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122 | £123 | £362 | £311 | £1.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 14 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION OF SEPTEMBER 1988 AS AMENDED ON 3 DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE COLLEGE BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE COLLEGE (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY).
Area of benefit
KIDDERMINSTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
BAXTER COLLEGE
HABBERLEY ROAD
KIDDERMINSTER
DY11 5PQ
- Phone:
- 01562741524
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window