NEPAL EARTHQUAKE RECOVERY FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The people of Nepal are still suffering the effects of a severe humanitarian crisis following the 2015 earthquake. We aim to help facilitate their recovery through the funding and implementation of efficient projects adhering to our core values. To do so, NERF raises funds through events, social media and by approaching donors with collaborative programs designed with Nepalis, for Nepalis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Nepal
Governance
- 27 July 2015: CIO registration
- NERF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GERAINT JOHN | Chair | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Gerrard Strange | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Weisbaum | Trustee | 16 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALAIN JOSEPH MORRALL | Trustee | 27 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.61k | £8.40k | £2.66k | £2.89k | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.23k | £4.64k | £594 | £479 | £3.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 August 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 July 2023 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Jul 2015
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE EARTHQUAKE OF 25 APRIL 2015 IN THE FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF NEPAL AND ITS AFTER EFFECTS, IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, COMMUNITIES, AND/OR ORGANISATIONS AFFECTED.
Area of benefit
IN THE FEDERAL DEMOCRATIC REPUBLIC OF NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 BERNARD STREET
ST. ALBANS
AL3 5QN
- Phone:
- +4407737638079
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window