EMUNA CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of Jewish religion, in particular by the translation, publication and dissemination of the religious work of Rabbi Nachman
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 2015: CIO registration
- BRESLEV CHARITY (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN LEHMANN | Chair | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JAYME ROSENTHAL | Trustee | 12 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.28k | £11.41k | £8.44k | £9.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.78k | £10.94k | £7.88k | £9.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 May 2021 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION BY PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT RABBI NACHMAN’S TEACHINGS
Contact information
- Address:
-
30 THE DRIVE
LONDON
NW11 9SU
- Phone:
- 07785723026
- Email:
- simha570@yahoo.fr
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window