DOGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dogs Trust operates a network of rehoming centres across the UK; each provides dog accommodation, puppy houses, isolation blocks and treatment rooms. Dogs Trust provides financial assistance to allow owners in genuine need to have their dogs neutered through participating veterinary practices. Dogs Trust provides dog training and educational material on responsible dog ownership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£6,938,525
Donations and legacies | £6.94m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£6,854,340
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £6.85m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.85m | |
Retained for future use | £84.19k |
People

5 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Chile
- Cook Islands
- Hungary
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Italy
- Japan
- Latvia
- Lithuania
- Malawi
- Malta
- Mexico
- Nepal
- Northern Ireland
- Romania
- Russia
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
- Ukraine
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 02 August 2024: Standard registration
- DOGS TRUST WORLDWIDE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Swagat Choudhury | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP GILES DAUBENY | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Timothy Michael Pearey | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Nigel Morrison | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Louise Helen Allum | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE LOUISE HOWARD | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
William James Hyde Galgey | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Alexander | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Murphy | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Canavan | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Parmenter | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ian Philip Rose | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.24m | £3.85m | £4.33m | £6.44m | £6.94m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.19m | £3.91m | £4.32m | £6.40m | £6.85m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.24m | £3.84m | £4.33m | £6.44m | £6.94m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £13.55k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.19m | £3.91m | £4.32m | £6.40m | £6.85m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £3.53m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £311.78k | £209.80k | £279.04k | £301.01k | £479.55k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £45.21k | £0 | £58.55k | £42.62k | £136.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23 DEC 2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 OCT 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14 NOV 2023 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 MAY 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE (AND FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT WHETHER WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD) TO PROTECT DOGS AND OTHER ANIMALS IN THE DIRECTORS DISCRETION FROM MALTREATMENT, CRUELTY AND SUFFERING
Linked charities
- 02 August 2024 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 WAKLEY STREET
LONDON
EC1V 7RQ
- Phone:
- 02078370006
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window