THE LUJENNA EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting education by broadening educational experiences, improving access to education and improving educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Lucy Newsum BA | Chair | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEREMY HENRY MOORE NEWSUM DL | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ROSE FARLEY | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNA JASMINE NEWSUM | Trustee | 13 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ALICE DARLING | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.54k | £26.93k | £30.31k | £33.04k | £34.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.67k | £24.17k | £37.32k | £35.83k | £38.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 FEB 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WORLDWIDE IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Station Road
Swavesey
Cambridge
CB24 4QJ
- Phone:
- 01954232199
- Email:
- info@lujennatrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window