BRIGHOUSE SPIRITUALIST CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious organisation providing a place of worship and the promotion of the knowledge of Spiritualism
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 June 2015: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.16k | £4.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.68k | £5.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 13 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 10 March 2017 | 130 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 DEC 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION AND THE RELIGIOUS PHILOSOPHY OF SPIRITUALISM ON THE BASIS OF THE SEVEN PRINCIPLES OF SNU SPIRITUALISM.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window