Financial history FRIENDS OF HURST FARM

Charity number: 1165343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £29.47k £59.19k £53.03k £29.57k £68.95k
Total expenditure £16.49k £44.73k £39.70k £42.09k £69.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £25.20k £27.88k N/A £4.28k £6.10k