Financial history EAST HARTFORD AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 506484
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2015 30/06/2016
Total gross income £4.25k £15.15k £30.25k £45.94k £20.67k
Total expenditure £5.11k £4.28k £34.03k £34.84k £36.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 £500