VOICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voice delivers projects with children and young people aimed at helping them to explore and express the Christian faith and grow in their musical skills. We run school and community projects, local music groups, larger Junior Choir and Voice Youth Choir & Orchestra ensembles, songwriting courses and music residentials. We are based in the North West but connect with people from across the country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- City Of York
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Nottingham City
- Stockport
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 04 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha French | Trustee | 09 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Helen Hickin | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Instone | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE GELLERT | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.61k | £35.93k | £53.74k | £47.26k | £34.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.49k | £35.83k | £51.83k | £56.17k | £56.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 19 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 22 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 04 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE CHRISTIANITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (I) THE HOLDING OF CONCERTS, THE PRODUCTION AND DISTRIBUTION OF RECORDINGS AND THE DELIVERY OF COMMUNITY PROJECTS TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (II) PROMOTING THE PARTICIPATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN MUSIC THAT IS ROOTED IN CHRISTIAN VALUES BY PROVIDING MUSIC-MAKING PROJECTS AND PROGRAMMES AS A MEANS OF ENABLING THEM TO EXPLORE, GROW IN AND EXPRESS THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND DEVELOP THEIR MUSICAL SKILLS AND UNDERSTANDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 PELHAM ROAD
THELWALL
WARRINGTON
WA4 2HF
- Phone:
- 07841435358
- Email:
- simon@voicemusic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window