LIMPSFIELD GRANGE SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of students at Limpsfield Grange School by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities (not required to be provided by the Local Authority) for education at the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 September 2015: Standard registration
- 20 September 2023: Funds received from 800109 THE FRIENDS OF THE GRANGE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JACQUELINE TANNER | Trustee | 21 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
SARAH WILD | Trustee | 21 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.29k | £31.39k | £17.77k | £11.50k | £263.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.54k | £26.72k | £18.18k | £11.26k | £48.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 September 2024 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21/09/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT LIMPSFIELD GRANGE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES (NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIMPSFIELD GRANGE SCHOOL
89 BLUEHOUSE LANE
OXTED
RH8 0RZ
- Phone:
- 01883713928
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window