Accounts and annual returns LIVING LIFE CHURCH

Charity Number: 506492
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 September 2010 16 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2009 12 January 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2008 28 August 2009 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2008 Not Required
Annual return 29 September 2007 06 March 2009 220 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 September 2007 Not Required