A PENNY4NEPAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Penny4nepal works with children, their families and helping to implement projects in Health, Education, Water and Sanitation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Nepal
Governance
- 28 July 2015: Standard registration
- AP4N (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ARJUN SINGH | Chair | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
NABA RAJ NEUPANE | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAGANNATH SAPKOTA | Trustee | 13 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
GADAM RAI | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
INDRA CHHETRI | Trustee | 07 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BAL KRISHNA DAHAL | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUBIN GURUNG | Trustee | 10 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
PUKAR SHRESTHA | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
ASHITA GURUNG | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
PRAKASH GURUNG | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
DIRGA RAJ KHAN | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
SANGITA GURUNG | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
AMRIT RAMUDAMU | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
||||
SHANT SHRESTHA | Trustee | 31 July 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.31k | £2.10k | £8.64k | £1.62k | £1.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.26k | £5.66k | £28.05k | £1.62k | £1.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 28 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/07/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/07/2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, RELIEF OF SICKNESS, PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF CHILDREN LIVING IN NEPAL BY HELPING TO IMPLEMENT PROJECTS IN HEALTH, EDUCATION, WATER AND SANITATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
499 OXFORD ROAD
READING
RG30 1HF
- Phone:
- 07736393434
- Email:
- contact@apenny4nepal.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window