MARSDEN COMMUNITY TRUST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Marsden Community Trust exists to take on assets and run them for the benefit of Marsden, West Yorkshire, and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 24 August 2016: Standard registration
- 30 July 2024: Funds received from 514061 MARSDEN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- MCT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN COLLETT | Chair | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Antony Sprawson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Hanson | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Louise Warwick | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Boothroyd | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Warmington | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Ellis | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Lord | Trustee | 16 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Hurn | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.85k | £128.66k | £386.75k | £79.97k | £108.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £78.92k | £114.61k | £81.19k | £310.08k | £125.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.39k | £96.64k | £1.38k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JAN 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 3.1 TO ADVANCE HERITAGE GENERALLY AND/OR PRESERVE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, THE HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL AND CONSTRUCTIONAL HERITAGE EXISTING IN AND AROUND MARSDEN IN BUILDINGS (INCLUDING ANY STRUCTURE OR ERECTION, AND ANY PART OF A BUILDING AS SO DEFINED) OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL, ARCHITECTURAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST; 3.2 TO ADVANCE THE ARTS, CULTURE, EDUCATION, HEALTH AND WELL-BEING BY (BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN WHICH THESE ACTIVITIES CAN TAKE PLACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN MARSDEN AND/OR THOSE WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES. 3.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE. 3.4 TO ADVANCE ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT IN MARSDEN THROUGH THE PROVISION, MAINTENANCE AND/OR IMPROVEMENT OF PUBLIC OPEN SPACE AND OTHER PUBLIC AMENITIES AND OTHER ENVIRONMENTAL AND REGENERATION PROJECTS (BUT SUBJECT TO APPROPRIATE SAFEGUARDS TO ENSURE THAT THE PUBLIC BENEFITS SO ARISING CLEARLY OUTWEIGH ANY PRIVATE BENEFIT THEREBY CONFERRED ON PRIVATE LANDOWNERS) AND 3.6 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE DIRECTORS IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARSDEN MECHANICS
PEEL STREET
MARSDEN
HUDDERSFIELD
HD7 6BW
- Phone:
- 01484844587
- Email:
- info@marsdenmechanics.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window