Accounts and annual returns DARUL TACLIM WAL IFTA

Charity Number: 1163677
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 10 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 10 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 24 April 2024 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 24 April 2024 24 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 03 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 03 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 02 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 02 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 April 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required