TRINITY CENTRE WHITBY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trinity Centre is a social activity centre for older people in Whitby and the surrounding rural area. The centre aims to combat social isolation amongst the lonely and disadvantaged older people of the district by enhancing a person's self worth by the provision of activities and events that encourage people to develop new skills, make new friends and feel a valued member of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 16 November 2015: CIO registration
- 29 April 2016: Funds received from 702342 TRINITY U R C WHITBY COMMUNITY PROJECTS
- TRINITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNCILLOR CAROLYN WATKINSON | Chair | 13 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bristow | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Thompson | Trustee | 04 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN ALMACK | Trustee | 16 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRENDA EASTON | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.70k | £89.18k | £18.58k | £15.98k | £571 | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.15k | £61.07k | £50.90k | £40.35k | £21.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £6.31k | £7.42k | £1.82k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £10.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 16 Nov 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF ELDERLY PERSONS LIVING IN WHITBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, GEOGRAPHICAL ISOLATION, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 2.THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG ELDERLY PERSONS LIVING IN WHITBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA WHO ARE EXCLUDED OR PARTLY EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY BECAUSE OF AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, GEOGRAPHICAL ISOLATION, OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES, OR WHO ARE UNABLE TO DRIVE OR EASILY ACCESS PUBLIC TRANSPORT, BY THE PROVISION OF: I: RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES II: OUTINGS AND SOCIAL TRIPS INCLUDING TRANSPORT TO AND FROM HOME III: ADVOCACY AND GENERAL SUPPORT, IV: RAISING AWARENESS OF THE ISSUES AFFECTING ELDERLY PEOPLE BOTH GENERALLY AND IN RELATION TO THEIR SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Hallcliffe
Thorpe Bank
Fylingthorpe
Whitby
North Yorkshire
YO22 4UA
- Phone:
- 01947601548
- Email:
- info@trinitycentrewhitby.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window