SHEFFIELD PLAY BUS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 June 1977: Standard registration
- 27 October 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- SHEFFIELD PLAY BUS (Working name)
- GRIMESTHORPE PLAY BUS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 17 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 17 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 AUGUST 1972 AMENDED 3 DECEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF TWO AND A HALF YEARS AND FIVE YEARS. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR HELPING AND EDUCATING CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF TWO AND A HALF YEARS AND THIRTEEN YEARS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITY, THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window