Financial history THE PLAYHOUSE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1164341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £131.24k £110.03k £168.04k £113.91k £105.51k
Total expenditure £166.65k £101.02k £144.63k £88.79k £94.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £18.41k £12.98k £550
Income from government grants £3.34k N/A N/A N/A N/A