ROTHERHAM WOMENS REFUGE MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ROTHERHAM WOMEN'S REFUGE (RWR) PROVIDES A RANGE OF ACCOMMODATION, SUPPORT AND ADVOCACY SERVICES TO WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO ARE EXPERIENCING OR HAVE FLED A DOMESTIC VIOLENCE SITUATIONS. RWR ALSO DELIVERS A RANGE OF PREVENTATIVE WORK IN SCHOOLS AND OTHER SETTINGS AND PROVIDES DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND SAFEGURADING TRAINING TO SINGLE AND MULTI-AGENCY GROUPS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Rotherham
Governance
- 28 June 1977: Standard registration
- 09 May 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 09 May 2012: Funds transferred to 1141699 Hopian
- ROTHERHAM WOMENS REFUGE (Working name)
- ROTHERHAM ASSOCIATION FOR BATTERED WIVES (Previous name)
- WOMENS REFUGE MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £384.36k | £390.18k | £526.30k | £554.05k | £450.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £419.44k | £448.15k | £540.49k | £544.89k | £479.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £3.84k | £7.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £510.64k | £540.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £2.29k | £1.54k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £9.53k | £3.77k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £532.42k | £540.76k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £8.07k | £4.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | 24 April 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 04 November 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 05 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 10 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 23 November 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 11 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 22 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 DECEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 16 JULY 1990 AND 8 SEPTEMBER 1997.
Charitable objects
(A)TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE EXPOSED TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION. (B)TO RELIEVE ANY WOMAN OR CHILD IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WHO MAY BE TEMPORARILY HOMELESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES AND BY THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL HEALTH IN SUCH WAYS AS SHALL RELIEVE THEIR NEED; AND (C)TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE CAUSES AND EFFECTS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND THE PREVENTION THEREOF, AND TO UNDERTAKE OR CONTRIBUTE TO RESEARCH INTO SUCH MATTERS AND/OR PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN DISTRICT OF ROTHERHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window