LEICESTERSHIRE & RUTLAND BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of NHS and other medical institutions with the delivery of blood, blood products and items in support of patient care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
- Rutland
Governance
- 09 October 2015: CIO registration
- LRBB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVER WILLIAM BRADSHAW CUFFLIN | Chair | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Spong | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Bostock | Trustee | 10 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
EBRAHIM AHMED | Trustee | 15 July 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £61.25k | £22.44k | £78.81k | £47.61k | £65.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.05k | £29.92k | £24.08k | £41.26k | £50.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT OF URGENTLY NEEDED BLOOD, DRUGS, HUMAN BREAST MILK AND OTHER MEDICAL REQUIREMENTS BETWEEN HOSPITALS AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION BANKS PRIMARILY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN LEICESTERSHIRE AND RUTLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Benenden Way
Ashby De La Zouch
Leicestershire
LE65 2QS
- Phone:
- 07976 802 956
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window