NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE WOMEN'S AID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist the relief of women (and their children) who have suffered or who are at risk of suffering domest violence . To advance the education of the public in the issues surrounding domestic violence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 07 July 1977: Standard registration
- NORTH LINCS WOMENS AID (Working name)
- BATTERED WIVES' REFUGE (Previous name)
- SCUNTHORPE WOMEN'S AID (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAY JEAN PRICE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lisa Bridget Vickers | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Swan | Trustee | 09 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE ANNE STEPHENSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £667 | £744 | £434 | £911 | £1.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £996 | £653 | £420 | £1.13k | £503 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/01/1977 AS AMENDED ON 27/01/1990 AS AMENDED ON 22/05/1996 AS AMENDED ON 20/05/1997 AS AMENDED ON 06/05/2014
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF WOMEN (AND THEIR CHILDREN) WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF SUFFERING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ACCOMMODATION.
Area of benefit
NORTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Lincolnshire Women's Aid
c/o VANL
4 - 6 Robert Street
SCUNTHORPE
DN15 6NG
- Phone:
- 00000 000000
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window