Financial history SOUTHEND FOODBANK

Charity number: 1163160
Charity reporting is up to date (35 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £86.84k £142.80k £103.70k £245.80k £488.38k
Total expenditure £34.73k £74.98k £113.20k £191.50k £352.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.00k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.00k