THE VOYAGE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide help and support to adults who have or who are suffering any form of abuse
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Brierley | Chair | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEESA VOGT | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL CRITCHLEY | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 576 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1306 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1671 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 27 Oct 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE THROUGH TORTURE AND/OR INHUMAN OR DEGRADING TREATMENT OR PUNISHMENT AS DEFINED BY ARTICLE 3 OF THE HUMAN RIGHTS ACT 1998, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING RETREAT FACILITIES WHICH OFFER THEM HELP AND ASSISTANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Bank Lane
BLACKBURN
BB1 2AX
- Phone:
- 07940236433
- Email:
- thevoyage52@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window