Trustees LANCASHIRE YOUTH CHALLENGE

Charity number: 1163469
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas Drake Chair 07 December 2022
None on record
Julie Brown Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Sylvie Maxwell Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Michael Sumsion Trustee 04 December 2024
None on record
Craig Peter Brown Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Amanda Obiajulu Nwadukwe Trustee 02 March 2022
None on record
Joshua Lightbown Trustee 05 May 2021
None on record