WORTHING SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of orchestral performances, education and community projects nationally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 November 2015: CIO registration
- WSO (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Steggall | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|||||
David Smith | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicolette Babbage-Clark | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Smith | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robertson | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN GIBBONS | Trustee | 12 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sean McDonald | Trustee | 03 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149.95k | £1.79k | £71.54k | £124.08k | £195.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.63k | £4.64k | £75.32k | £117.23k | £159.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 25 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 24 Nov 2015 as amended on 02 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY MUSICAL EDUCATION, AND TO ENCOURAGE THE ARTS, INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DRAMA, MIME, DANCING AND SINGING, AND TO FORMULATE, PREPARE AND ESTABLISH SCHEMES THEREFOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HIGHDOWN AVENUE
WORTHING
BN13 1PU
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Website:
-
worthingsymphony.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window