PECULIAR HOUSE CHURCH

Charity Number: 1163479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Religious Activities: Peculiar House Church provides a place of worship for it's members and the wider community in order to advance the Christian Religion (Gospel of our Lord and Saviour, Jesus Christ). And contributing to the spiritual and moral education of children, contributing towards a better society for example by promoting social cohesion and righteous living.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024

Total income: £54,612
Total expenditure: £41,141

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Southwark
  • Nigeria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 September 2015: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE PECULIAR HOUSE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev TOSAN ABUWA Trustee 27 September 2015
SAVE THE EARTH MISSION FOR CHRIST (STEMFC)
Received: 67 days late
PASTOR CHINEDU OBI Trustee 01 May 2015
DIVINE ENCOUNTER MINISTRY
Received: On time
HOUSE OF COMFORT CHURCH
Received: On time
OLUFUKE ABUWA Trustee 01 May 2015
None on record
NNASHA MICHAEL-IHUNDE Trustee 01 May 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £44.09k £44.51k £33.83k £56.94k £54.61k
Total expenditure £39.72k £31.86k £38.65k £54.87k £41.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2024 12 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2023 13 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 March 2020 01 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 01 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
47 Rushey Green
2nd Floor
Capital House
Catford
London
SE6 4AS
Phone:
07782375196
Website:

No information available