THE MARGARET MASSARELLA CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has been fund raising to provide funds to help people with cancer to pay for their treatment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 June 2015: Standard registration
- MARGARET MASSARELLA CANCER TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN LYNDA TIMSON | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL FRANCIS MASSARELLA | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR BRYAN JOHN WATKINS | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANCIS HARDBATTLE | Trustee | 13 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.88k | £655 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.90k | £216 | £216 | £216 | £516 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 03 March 2021 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 MAR 2015
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST AND TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND OTHERWISE TO BENEFIT POOR INDIVIDUAL PERSONS OR PERSONS OF LIMITED OR INSUFFICIENT MEANS AND/OR THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR THEIR CARERS TO FUND PRIVATE AND ANY OTHER MEDICAL TREATMENT OR CARE OR THE COST OF CONSULTATIONS OR EXAMINATIONS FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING OR BELIEVED TO BE SUFFERING FROM CANCER, HEART DISEASE OR OTHER SERIOUS HEALTH OR MEDICAL CONDITIONS THE COST OF WHICH IS NOT MET OUT OF LOCAL OR PUBLIC FUNDS OR TAXES BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE OR OTHERWISE TO INCLUDE FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT ANY RESPITE TREATMENT OR CARE FOR PATIENTS AND/OR THEIR FAMILIES AND/OR CARERS AND ANY OTHER PURPOSE RECOGNISED AS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Cottage
Limby Hall Lane
Swannington
Coalville
LE67 8QH
- Phone:
- 01530814880
- Email:
- john@hardbattles.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window