FUNDRAISE FOR VIETNAM

Charity number: 1163517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraise For Vietnam (FFV), a non-profit organisation that goes above and beyond to help support the disadvantaged children in Vietnam. Our work varies from supporting small orphanages, Agent orange centres, small villages, taking kids off the street and back into education, provide scholarships and other small projects. We also promote fundraising and voluntary schemes across the globe to aid V

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £563
Total expenditure: £87

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey
  • Vietnam

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 2015: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FFV (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MICHAEL HA LE Chair 01 January 2014
None on record
HOANG NAM LE Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record
MICHAEL RUSSELL-MOTT Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.71k £4.31k £2.08k £1.40k £563
Total expenditure £4.85k £1.75k £4.16k £120 £87
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 November 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 January 2022 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
9 LEMSFORD CLOSE
GROVELANDS ROAD
LONDON
N15 6BY
Phone:
07549794396