Help For Persecuted Christians

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of safe houses for women trapped in forced marriages Debt Relief programmes Clean water projects Legal Aid provision for victims of blasphemy laws and persecution International advocacy UK poverty eradication programmes in local community Social integration programmes for teenagers Redbridge Homeless help in local community of Redbridge Community Cohesion programmes in Redbridge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Redbridge
- India
- Pakistan
- Sri Lanka
- Thailand
Governance
- 01 September 2015: Standard registration
- BRITISH PAKISTANI CHRISTIANS LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joel Kyari | Chair | 10 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Okorodudu | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
DORAH MAYAH | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Chowdhry | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £139.44k | £92.65k | £91.56k | £116.77k | £93.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.77k | £139.72k | £96.76k | £108.01k | £97.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.49k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 August 2023
(These accounts |
20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 08 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 OCT 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/06/2015 as amended on 12 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- (1) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY : (A) THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE, GENDER, DISABILITY , SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RELIGION; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY; (C) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS; (D) CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH ON EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY ISSUES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS TO THE PUBLIC; (E) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. (F) ACTING AS ADVOCATES FOR PAKISTANI CHRISTIANS FACING PERSECUTION. (2) THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: A) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS. 3. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID. 4. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN THE UK OR PAKISTAN BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 74934
PO Box 6945
LONDON
W1A 6US
- Phone:
- 02034885316
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window