Financial history FRIENDS OF COCKERMOUTH SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1163090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £2.49k £11.71k £2.04k £800 £800
Total expenditure £373 £1.51k £1.27k £1.18k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A